WA SB5798 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing public school participation in the community eligibility provision of the United States department of agriculture.
Title
Increasing public school participation in the community eligibility provision of the United States department of agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1878 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-04 - Effective date 3/4/2022.