WA SB5794 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating the practice of acupuncture and Eastern medicine.
Title
Regulating the practice of acupuncture and Eastern medicine.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1865 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5794&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5794.pdf |