WA SB5783 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing peace officers to assist the department of corrections with the supervision of offenders.
Title
Authorizing peace officers to assist the department of corrections with the supervision of offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Brian Dansel [R] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-31 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |