WA SB5775 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 8/30/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 8/30/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing for a veteran designation on drivers' licenses and identicards.
Title
Allowing for a veteran designation on drivers' licenses and identicards.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 8/30/2017. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 185, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-25 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-28 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |