WA SB5762 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state contracts with veteran-owned businesses.
Title
Concerning state contracts with veteran-owned businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5762&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5762.pdf |