WA SB5752 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the uniform correction or clarification of defamation act.
Title
Creating the uniform correction or clarification of defamation act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-07 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Revert to Rules White Sheet. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-21 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-09 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5752&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5752.pdf |