WA SB5750 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain licensed distillery information from public disclosure.
Title
Exempting certain licensed distillery information from public disclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1838 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5750&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5750.pdf |