WA SB5735 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning registered sex or kidnapping offenders.
Title
Concerning registered sex or kidnapping offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-04-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-03 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-03 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |