WA SB5720 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning passenger-carrying vehicles for railroad employees.
Title
Concerning passenger-carrying vehicles for railroad employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1620 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5720&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5720.pdf |