WA SB5719 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dual credit costs.
Title
Concerning dual credit costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 600 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 600 | 310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |