WA SB5708 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating flexibility in the delivery of long-term care services.
Title
Creating flexibility in the delivery of long-term care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-16 | Chapter 366, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-16 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-09 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-16 | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-16 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-03-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-04 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2011-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-02 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-21 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-08 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |