WA SB5706 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the community reinvestment account and community reinvestment program.
Title
Creating the community reinvestment account and community reinvestment program.
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1827 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 79 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 84 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |