WA SB5705 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning community redevelopment financing in apportionment districts.
Title
Concerning community redevelopment financing in apportionment districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. James Kastama [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-18 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-18 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-08 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1881 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.