WA SB5699 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electronic product recycling.
Title
Concerning electronic product recycling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Chapter 305, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-03-21 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-21 | House | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1507 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Environment.