WA SB5677 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Walla Walla sweet onion day.
Title
Recognizing Walla Walla sweet onion day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |