WA SB5663 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing streamlined procedures for compliance with the State v. Blake decision in order to improve criminal justice system coordination, create efficiencies, and reduce costs.
Title
Establishing streamlined procedures for compliance with the State v. Blake decision in order to improve criminal justice system coordination, create efficiencies, and reduce costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | And refer to Law & Justice. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | New Code | See Bill Text |