WA SB5636 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a process for county legislative authorities to withdraw from voluntary planning under the growth management act.
Title
Providing a process for county legislative authorities to withdraw from voluntary planning under the growth management act.
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1224 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5636&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5636.pdf |