WA SB5627 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning injured workers' rights during independent medical examinations.
Title
Concerning injured workers' rights during independent medical examinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1763 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.