WA SB5607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dual language learning in early learning and K-12 education.
Title
Concerning dual language learning in early learning and K-12 education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1322 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.