WA SB5578 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - On motion, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing service requirements for appeals of decisions by the board of tax appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing service requirements for appeals of decisions by the board of tax appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateOn motion, referred to Law & Justice.
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-03-10SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2023-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-02-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-02-09SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3405542Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5578&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5578.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5578-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5578%20SBA%20LAW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5578%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5578%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128497&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30634&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback