WA SB5575 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing sales and use tax exemptions to encourage coal-fired electric generation plants to convert to natural gas-fired plants.
Title
Providing sales and use tax exemptions to encourage coal-fired electric generation plants to convert to natural gas-fired plants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | First Reading. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2016-02-24 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-06-29 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |