WA SB5565 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing fire districts and regional fire authorities to carry out certain treasurer functions.
Title
Allowing fire districts and regional fire authorities to carry out certain treasurer functions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 90, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-18 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
52 | 16 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 16 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 16 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 26 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |