WA SB5554 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the job skills program.
Title
Regarding the job skills program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-19 | Chapter 554, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-19 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-25 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-24 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-24 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-24 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-24 | House receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-19 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-24 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-24 | HE - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. | |
2009-01-30 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-01-30 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-01-30 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-30 | EDTI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |