WA SB5553 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing suicide by permitting the voluntary waiver of firearm rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing suicide by permitting the voluntary waiver of firearm rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateEffective date 6/7/2018*.
2018-03-21SenateChapter 145, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-21SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-05SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-02-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-23HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2018-02-21HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-15HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-14HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2018-01-24SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-01-24SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-24Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-01-18SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-11SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-27SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback