WA SB5547 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding regulatory authority over cannabinoids that may be impairing and providing for enhanced product safety and consumer information disclosure about marijuana products.
Title
Expanding regulatory authority over cannabinoids that may be impairing and providing for enhanced product safety and consumer information disclosure about marijuana products.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1668 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 50 | 101 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 326 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |