WA SB5537 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Washington state hospital patient care unit staffing innovation collaborative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Washington state hospital patient care unit staffing innovation collaborative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-23SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-17SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2023-02-16SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-16SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2023-02-16SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2023-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4370New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5537&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5537.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5537%20SBA%20HLTC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5537%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5537%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5537%20SBA%20WM%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5537%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66947
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128331&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30775&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback