WA SB5537 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding community-based behavioral health facilities through issuance of state bonds.
Title
Expanding community-based behavioral health facilities through issuance of state bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |