WA SB5535 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recording of real property encumbrance transfers and assignments.
Title
Concerning the recording of real property encumbrance transfers and assignments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | And refer to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | GOV - Majority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5535&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5535.pdf |