WA SB5533 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a model vehicle pursuit policy.
Title
Concerning the creation of a model vehicle pursuit policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |