WA SB5521 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding persons who serve legal process to assault in the third degree provisions.
Title
Adding persons who serve legal process to assault in the third degree provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5521&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5521.pdf |