WA SB5521 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting children under the age of eighteen from the harmful effects of exposure to ultraviolet radiation associated with tanning devices.
Title
Protecting children under the age of eighteen from the harmful effects of exposure to ultraviolet radiation associated with tanning devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Nathan Schlicher [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5521&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5521.pdf |