WA SB5518 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of critical constituent and state operational data against the financial and personal harm caused by ransomware and other malicious cyber activities. Revised for 2nd Substitute: Concerning cybersecurity.
Title
Concerning the protection of critical constituent and state operational data against the financial and personal harm caused by ransomware and other malicious cyber activities. Revised for 2nd Substitute: Concerning cybersecurity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 124, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1464 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 105 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 105 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |