WA SB5511 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the frequency of local sales and use tax changes.
Title
Reducing the frequency of local sales and use tax changes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-03 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |