WA SB5510 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning renewal of the sales and use tax for transportation benefit districts.
Title
Concerning renewal of the sales and use tax for transportation benefit districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-25 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |