WA SB5503 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state board of health rules regarding on-site sewage systems.
Title
Concerning state board of health rules regarding on-site sewage systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 21, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-26 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1338 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.