WA SB5502 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring access to substance use disorder treatment.
Title
Ensuring access to substance use disorder treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Sen. Nikki Torres [R] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass without amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass without amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 405, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-23 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |