WA SB5484 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning assault in the third degree occurring in areas used in connection with court proceedings.
Title
Concerning assault in the third degree occurring in areas used in connection with court proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-27 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 256, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 35; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-03 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1653 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.