WA SB5476 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishing the death penalty.
Title
Abolishing the death penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] |
Sen. Debbie Regala [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-23 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5476&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5476.pdf |