WA SB5463 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning efficiencies in the department of ecology processing of water right change applications that move the point of withdrawal reducing the potential for surface water body impacts.
Title
Concerning efficiencies in the department of ecology processing of water right change applications that move the point of withdrawal reducing the potential for surface water body impacts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1548 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5463&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5463.pdf |