WA SB5450 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning superior court judges.
Title
Concerning superior court judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 53, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-21 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Law & Justice. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |