WA SB5438 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Promoting the completion of environmental impact statements within two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting the completion of environmental impact statements within two years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenatePlaced on Rules White Sheet.
2017-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-27HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment
2017-03-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-02SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-02Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-09SenateEET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.

Same As/Similar To

HB1086 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback