WA SB5436 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collective bargaining over the content of reports by ombuds and the selection of ombuds and their staff who oversee law enforcement personnel.
Title
Concerning collective bargaining over the content of reports by ombuds and the selection of ombuds and their staff who oversee law enforcement personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |