WA SB5436 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child care access.
Title
Concerning child care access.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5436&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5436.pdf |