WA SB5432 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the privacy of lottery players.
Title
Concerning the privacy of lottery players.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1221 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.