WA SB5399 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of background checks for persons who work with children, persons with developmental disabilities, and vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning the use of background checks for persons who work with children, persons with developmental disabilities, and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules Green Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |