WA SB5390 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a programmatic safe harbor agreement on forestlands.
Title
Establishing a programmatic safe harbor agreement on forestlands.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 119, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-22 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:30 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |