WA SB5369 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding commercial shellfish enforcement.
Title
Regarding commercial shellfish enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Harry Morton [R] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] |
Sen. Debbie Regala [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-08 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-08 | NRMW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-31 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-21 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Marine Waters. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1453 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/22/2011.