WA SB5368 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging rural economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging rural economic development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Local Government (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-22SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-19SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2021-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-11HouseCommittee amendment
2021-04-11HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2021-04-07HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-04-01HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-04-01HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-03-23HouseLG - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM.
2021-03-17HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government
2021-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-05Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-05Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-12SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-11SenateHLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35a14New CodeSee Bill Text
3670aNew CodeSee Bill Text
3670a020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3670a070Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
3670a130Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
3670a280Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3670a330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9058080Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5368&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5368.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5368-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5368-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5368-S2.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/5368-S2%20AMH%20LG%20H1351.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/5368-S2%20AMH%20APP%20H1490.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368-S2%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5368-S2%20HBA%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5368-S2%20HBR%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5368-S2%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368-S2%20SBR%20HA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5368-S2%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5368-S2%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124125&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28590&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124125&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124125&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5368&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124125&actionText=LG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28943&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124125&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20but%20without%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Local%20Government.&mId=28974&isInit=False&bienn
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124125&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5368&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124125&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-19-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5368&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback