WA SB5368 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Granting binding arbitration rights to certain juvenile court services and department of corrections employees.
Title
Granting binding arbitration rights to certain juvenile court services and department of corrections employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. Joseph Zarelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-21 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-21 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-21 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1291 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.