WA SB5348 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning assisted reproduction.
Title
Concerning assisted reproduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Subjects
CHILDREN
CIVIL ACTIONS AND PROCEDURE
CRIMES
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
SENTENCES AND SENTENCING
WOMEN
CIVIL ACTIONS AND PROCEDURE
CRIMES
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
SENTENCES AND SENTENCING
WOMEN
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 130 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 94a | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 04 | 080 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 36 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |